EP2145006 - EXPRESSION SYSTEM USED FOR THE ANTIBIOTIC-FREE PRODUCTION OF POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Enzymes GmbH Feldbergstrasse 78 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CADOT, Céline 12, avenue Sainte Marie 92370 Chaville / FR | 02 /
PLOSS, Tina Georgenstr. 55 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | 03 /
SCHWERDTFEGER, Ruth Birngartenweg 107 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
WINTER, Bruno Rotenbergstrasse 87 70190 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
CADOT, Céline 12, avenue Sainte Marie 92370 Chaville / FR | ||
02 /
PLOSS, Tina Auf dem Zehnthöbel 17 b 64572 Büttelborn / DE | |||
03 /
SCHWERDTFEGER, Ruth Birngartenweg 107 64291 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
WINTER, Bruno Rotenbergstrasse 87 70190 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734603.7 | 12.03.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008EP01977 | Priority number, date | DE20071021001 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007021001 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008135113 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145006 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145006 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/75, C12N9/04 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | EXPRESSIONSSYSTEM ZUR ANTIBIOTIKAFREIEN PRODUKTION VON POLYPEPTIDEN | [2010/03] | English: | EXPRESSION SYSTEM USED FOR THE ANTIBIOTIC-FREE PRODUCTION OF POLYPEPTIDES | [2010/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'EXPRESSION PERMETTANT LA PRODUCTION DE POLYPEPTIDES SANS ANTIBIOTIQUES | [2010/03] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2008 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | HR | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | MT | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | NO | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
HR | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
HR | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/27] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005061716 (SCIL PROTEINS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13,17,18 * page 4; claims 1-19 *; | [X] - MORBIDONI H R ET AL, "Synthesis of sn-Glycerol 3 -Phosphate, a key precursor of membrane lipids, in Bacillus subtilis", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19951001), vol. 177, no. 20, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5899 - 5905, XP002186763 [X] 14-16,19-30 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [A] - HAGG PETER ET AL, "A host/plasmid system that is not dependent on antibiotics and antibiotic resistance genes for stable plasmid maintenance in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040701), vol. 111, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 17 - 30, XP002316099 [A] 1-13,17,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2004.03.010 | [PX] - CHEN XIAO HUA ET AL, "Comparative analysis of the complete genome sequence of the plant growth-promoting bacterium Bacillus amyloliquefaciens FZB42", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200709), vol. 25, no. 9, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1007 - 1014, XP002493384 [PX] 14-16,19-30 * page 1008 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1325 |