EP2139426 - DENTAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MDI Dental- und Implantattechnik GmbH Mülheimer Strasse 60a 47057 Duisburg / DE | [2012/19] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Schneiders, Servatius Uhlandstrasse 87 44791 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIESELMANN, Dirk-Rolf Löwenstrasse 2 CH-8001 Zürich / CH | 02 /
CESCHINSKI, Harald Wiesenstrasse 6 44789 Bochum / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) D-44787 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude) D-44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734627.6 | 15.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP02089 | Priority number, date | DE20071013703 | 19.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007013703 | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113532 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139426 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139426 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | DENTALIMPLANTAT | [2010/01] | English: | DENTAL IMPLANT | [2010/01] | French: | IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 04.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2008 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | AT | 15.03.2015 | IE | 15.03.2015 | LU | 15.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.03.2008 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
AT | 15.03.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | |
NO | 25.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5282746 (SELLERS GRADY C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4326841 (BECKER VERFAHRENSTECH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0226154 (BIOLOK INT INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |