EP2143104 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SPEECH QUALITY PREDICTION OF THE IMPACT OF TIME LOCALIZED DISTORTIONS OF AN AUDIO TRASMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | 13.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | ||
For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast -natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | |||
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | ||
For all designated states Nederlandse Centrale Organisatie Voor Toegepast Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEERENDS, John, Gerard Polderweg 26 NL-4585 PG Hengstdijk / NL | 02 /
VAN VUGT, Jeroen, Martijn Van Diemenstraat 60 NL-2518 VD The Hague / NL | 03 /
BANGMA, Menno Margrijhof 19 NL-2632 DG Nootdorp / NL | 04 /
NIAMUT, Omar, Aziz Vaartweg 104b NL-3131 HV Vlaardingen / NL | 05 /
BUSZ, Bartosz Jesierskiego 1/2 51-691 Wroclaw / PL | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/47] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08734847.0 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008EP02472 | Priority number, date | EP20070006550 | 29.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07006550 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008119510 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2143104 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
G10L25/69 (EP,US);
H04M3/2236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SPRACHQUALITÄTSVORHERSAGE DES EINFLUSSES VON ZEITLOKALISIERTEN VERZERRUNGEN EINES TONÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2010/02] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SPEECH QUALITY PREDICTION OF THE IMPACT OF TIME LOCALIZED DISTORTIONS OF AN AUDIO TRASMISSION SYSTEM | [2010/02] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME PRÉDISANT L'IMPACT DE DISTORSIONS LOCALISÉES DANS LE TEMPS SUR LA QUALITÉ DE LA PAROLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSIONS AUDIO | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 06.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1343145 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,13-17 * page 6, line 35 - page 10, line 16; figure 2 * [A] 3-12; | [A]WO2006033570 (TNO [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 10, line 5 - page 12, line 27; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - HOENE C ET AL, "Calculation of speech quality by aggregating the impacts of individual frame losses", QUALITY OF SERVICE - IWQOS 2005. 13TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, IWQOS 2005. PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL. 3552) SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (2005), ISBN 3-540-26294-6, pages 136 - 150, XP002443924 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - S. VORAN, "Perception of temporal discontinuity impairments in coded speech - a proposal for objective estimators and some subjective test results", PROC. OF THE 2ND INT. CONF. ON MEASUREMENT OF SPEECH AND AUDIO QUALITY IN NETWORKS, Prague, Czech Republic, (200305), XP002443925 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |