EP2134434 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING LIQUIDS, USING AN ELECTROLYTIC DRYING STAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neubert, Susanne Schauweg 66 24980 Nordhackstedt / DE | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUBERT, Joachim Römerstrasse 14 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | 02 /
STAAB, Karl Ferdinand Im Wiesbrunnen 10 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Liebl, Thomas NEUBAUER - LIEBL - BIERSCHNEIDER Münchener Strasse 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Liebl, Thomas NEUBAUER - LIEBL - BIERSCHNEIDER Münchener Strasse 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08735170.6 | 11.04.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008EP02864 | Priority number, date | DE20071017613 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007017613 | [2009/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008125283 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134434 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/06, B01D53/26, B01D59/40, C02F1/46, C02F1/461, C25B1/02, H01M8/04 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
B01D1/2881 (EP,US);
B01D1/22 (EP,US);
B01D5/0039 (EP,US);
B01D5/0057 (EP,US);
B01D5/006 (EP,US);
C02F1/041 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/448 (EP,US);
C02F1/461 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
C02F2201/46115 (EP,US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US);
Y02A20/131 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/133 (EP,US);
Y02W10/33 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT EINER TROCKNUNGSSTUFE MITTELS ELEKTROLYSE | [2009/52] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING LIQUIDS, USING AN ELECTROLYTIC DRYING STAGE | [2009/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDES AU MOYEN D'UNE ÉTAPE DE SÉCHAGE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | 04.08.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 13.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0711/12 | 16.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.07.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH192652 (SULZER AG [CH]) [Y] 23,24,61,62 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US3188283 (COLE LELAND G) [Y] 1-65 * column 9, line 29 - line 38 * * claim 6 *; | [YA]DE4104094 (GESSLAUER RUDOLF [DE]) [Y] 5,32 * column 4, line 23 - line 38 * [A] 1-4,6-29; | [Y]WO0047308 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 6-9,42-45 * paragraph [0077] *; | [Y]US6159380 (RUSSELL LARRY L [US], et al) [Y] 20,50* column 5, line 52 - line 64 *; | [Y]DE10108528 (NEUBERT SUSANNE [DE]) [Y] 1-31,46-49,51-57,61-63,65 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0051] * * claims 1-31 * * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10307112 (PROTON ENERGY SYS INC [US]) [Y] 10-13,33-42,58-60,64 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0050] * |