03.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
20.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
26.02.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
12.02.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
09.02.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
11.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.06.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.03.2010 |
First examination report |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
04.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
24.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|