EP2137449 - LINE CONNECTOR FOR MEDIA LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voss Automotive GmbH Leiersmühle 2-6 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORGMEIER, Olav Hambüchener Weg 4 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | 02 /
BRÜCK, Eduard Hütte 1 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
ERB, Ulrich Stettiner Str. 14 51145 Köln-Porz / DE | 04 /
GRÜNDEL, Reiner Hückeswagener Str. 109 51647 Gummersbach / DE | 05 /
LECHNER, Martin Am Dimberg 6 51789 Lindlar / DE | 06 /
PETERS, Frank Kirchstr. 25 51789 Lindlar / DE | 07 /
ROSENFELDT, Sascha Lange Strasse 129 44137 Dortmund / DE | 08 /
SCHWARZKOPF, Otfried Hofwiese 4 51515 Kürten / DE | 09 /
GÜNDÜZ, Ahmet Schwelmer Str. 3 42897 Remscheid / DE | 10 /
ISENBURG, Marco Schumannsdieken 33a 40885 Ratingen / DE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schlossbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Schloßbleiche 20 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08735439.5 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP53295 | Priority number, date | DE20072006115U | 26.04.2007 Original published format: DE 202007006115 U | DE20072009588U | 09.07.2007 Original published format: DE 202007009588 U | DE20071040786 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007040786 | DE20082003365U | 10.03.2008 Original published format: DE 202008003365 U | [2010/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131993 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2137449 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2137449 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2137449 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | [2012/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2137449 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L53/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F16L25/01 (EP,CN,US);
F16L53/38 (EP,CN,US);
H05B3/42 (EP,US);
H05B3/54 (CN);
F01N2610/02 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,CN,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP,CN,US);
H01R13/005 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T137/5474 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5907 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEITUNGSVERBINDER FÜR MEDIENLEITUNGEN | [2010/01] | English: | LINE CONNECTOR FOR MEDIA LINES | [2010/01] | French: | RACCORD POUR CONDUITES D'ACHEMINEMENT DE SUBSTANCES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11168387.6 / EP2363627 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2012
REHAU AG+Co Rechtsabteilung Rehniumhaus Otto-Hahn-Strasse 2 95111 Rehau / DE | 02
15.03.2012
TI Automotive (Heidelberg) GmbH Dischinger Strasse 11 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2012
REHAU AG+Co Rechtsabteilung Rehniumhaus Otto-Hahn-Strasse 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
02
15.03.2012
TI Automotive (Heidelberg) GmbH Dischinger Strasse 11 69123 Heidelberg / DE Opponent's representative Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 DE-45127 Essen / DE | 23.04.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.09.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.08.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.08.2015 | Appeal received No. T1666/15 | 03.11.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.09.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 13.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | LU | 19.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | AT | 19.03.2013 | [2014/37] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
LU | 19.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
LU | 19.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3932727 (TRUE CECIL WAYNE) [A] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0764810 (SCARZELLA LUCIANO [IT]) [A] 11,12,18,19 * abstract *; | [A]US6617556 (WEDEL MICHAEL W [CN]) [A] 4 * page 1, paragraph 6; figure - *; | [X]US2005083638 (WARREN H M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,21 * page 4, paragraph 49 - page 5, paragraph 52; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202005004602U (EICHENAUER HEIZELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,7* the whole document *; | [X]DE202006003590U (SCHLEMMER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract *; | [X]EP1710484 (DBK DAVID & BAADER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * page 5, paragraphs 14-22; figure - * | Opposition | US2793280 | JPS51123223 | US4069409 | JPS5451473U | EP0219126 | DE8704903U | US5544275 | US5791377 | WO03021087 | EP1513227 | JP2005193614 | WO2005124219 | EP1777452 | - BD 2, PAGES 218,219 UND 224. BD 3, PAGES 90 UND 91, LEXIKON DER CHEMIE, BERLIN, SPEKTRUM AKADEMISCHEN VERLAG HEIDELBERG, (1999), ISBN 3-8274-0380-4 |