EP2153005 - APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING CLOSED SPACES FROM FLOODING OR CONTAMINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minerva S.r.l. Via G. del Pian dei Carpini 96/5 50127 Firenze / IT | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIACOSA, Sergio Via Manin 28 I-50041 Calenzano / IT | 02 /
PINI, Edoardo Via di Salenzano 4 I-50041 Calenzano / IT | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08736331.3 | 17.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008EP54670 | Priority number, date | IT2007FI00095 | 18.04.2007 Original published format: IT FI20070095 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128964 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153005 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B5/16, E06B7/23, F16J15/46 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
E06B7/2318 (EP,US);
E06B2009/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VON GESCHLOSSENEN RÄUMEN VOR ÜBERSCHWEMMUNG ODER VERUNREINIGUNGEN | [2010/07] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING CLOSED SPACES FROM FLOODING OR CONTAMINATIONS | [2010/07] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À PROTÉGER DES ESPACES FERMÉS DES INONDATIONS OU CONTAMINATIONS | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2010 | 30.04.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1571284 (SOMEC S R L [IT]) [X] 1-27 * claims 1,3,5,11,12 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, column 3, paragraphs 19,20,23,26-29 * * page 3, column 4, paragraph 36 * * page 4, column 5, paragraph 38 *; | [X]US4706413 (JAMES KENNETH S [US]) [X] 1-27 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 32 *; | [X]DE20203705U (PALLADIO TRADING S R L [IT]) [X] 1-4,8,27 * figure 1 * * page 7, line 26 - line 7 *; | [A]US5214241 (BENWELL BRUCE T [US]) [A] 5,6 * abstract *; | [A]DE7917514U (SCHROEDERS, THEO, 5140 ERKELENZ) [A] 17-20 * page 7 * * page 9 * |