EP2170562 - TOOL HOLDER FOR AN ELECTRIC TOOL, PARTICULARLY FOR A CHISEL HAMMER AND/OR DRILL HAMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Willy Lindenstr. 3 72149 Neustetten / DE | 02 /
KOEPF, Christian Vogelsangstrasse 21 73770 Denkendorf / DE | [2010/14] | Application number, filing date | 08736441.0 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP54830 | Priority number, date | DE20071028486 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007028486 | [2010/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008155152 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170562 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170562 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/08, B25D17/24 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B25D17/088 (EP,US);
B25D17/24 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0042 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0049 (EP,US);
B25D2222/57 (EP,US);
B25D2250/285 (EP,US);
B25D2250/371 (EP,US);
B25D2250/385 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17076 (US);
Y10T279/17094 (US);
Y10T279/17145 (US);
Y10T279/17461 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGHALTER FÜR EIN ELEKTROWERKZEUG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN MEISSEL- UND/ODER BOHRHAMMER | [2010/14] | English: | TOOL HOLDER FOR AN ELECTRIC TOOL, PARTICULARLY FOR A CHISEL HAMMER AND/OR DRILL HAMMER | [2010/14] | French: | PORTE-OUTIL POUR UN OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN MARTEAU BURINEUR ET/OU UN MARTEAU PERFORATEUR | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2008 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | HR | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | AT | 22.04.2013 | IE | 22.04.2013 | LU | 22.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | NO | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
AT | 22.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
NO | 06.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4491444 (RUMPP GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - line 42 *; | [X]EP1293303 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0030] - [0033]; figure 2 * * the whole document *; | [X]WO03022531 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US], et al) [X] 10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005016745 (HAHN NORBERT [DE]) [X] 10 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2410212 (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [X] 10* the whole document *; | [A]EP1695797 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE102005015100 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | Examination | DE4405697 | EP1958734 | by applicant | DE102005015100 | EP1958734 |