EP2139769 - FIXATION FOR PYLON BOX ON WINGS, CLAMPING A SIDE PANEL OF THE BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDES, Pascal Appartement 8 5 chemin de Tutau F-31600 Lherm / FR | 02 /
COMBES, Stéphane 521, chemin Parro F-31660 Buzet sur Tarn / FR | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
GARDES, Pascal Appartement 8, 5 chemin de Tutau F-31600 Lherm / FR | ||
02 /
COMBES, Stéphane 521, chemin Parro F-31660 Buzet sur Tarn / FR | |||
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
GARDES, Pascal 5 chemin de Tutau F-31600 Lherm / FR | ||
02 /
COMBES, Stéphane 521, chemin Parro F-31660 Buzet sur Tarn / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/01] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08736445.1 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP54838 | Priority number, date | FR20070054636 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: FR 0754636 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129042 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139769 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139769 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/26 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B64D27/404 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (US);
B64D27/402 (EP,US);
B64D27/406 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNG FÜR PYLONKASTEN AN FLÜGELN, FESTKLEMMEN EINER SEITENPLATTE DES KASTENS | [2010/01] | English: | FIXATION FOR PYLON BOX ON WINGS, CLAMPING A SIDE PANEL OF THE BOX | [2010/01] | French: | ATTACHE D'UN CAISSON DE MAT SUR UNE VOILURE, PINÇANT UN PANNEAU LATERAL DU CAISSON | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 26.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2008 | AT | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | LU | 22.04.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LU | 22.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6095456 (POWELL DONALD T [US]); | [A]EP1535837 (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP1538080 (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR]); | [A]FR2878229 (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) |