18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
25.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
24.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
19.08.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
04.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
20.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|