EP2139822 - GLASS ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED CHEMICAL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2014/18] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Watermael-Boitsfort / BE | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Chaussée de La Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIAGE, Fabian AGC Flat Glass Europe SA - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
BOULANGER, Pierre AGC Flat Glass Europe SA - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 03 /
COSTER, Dominique AGC Flat Glass Europe SA - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 04 /
LECOLLEY, François AGC Flat Glass Europe SA - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 05 /
VAN DEN NESTE, Marc AGC Flat Glass Europe SA - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Bayot, Daisy, et al AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Bayot, Daisy, et al AGC Glass Europe S.A. R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2010/27] | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric, et al AGC Glass Europe Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 08736585.4 | 25.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP55086 | Priority number, date | EP20070107026 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07107026 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008132173 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139822 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C14/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C03C14/006 (EP,US);
C03C2214/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | GLASARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTER CHEMIKALIENBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2010/01] | English: | GLASS ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED CHEMICAL RESISTANCE | [2010/01] | French: | ARTICLE EN VERRE A RESISTANCE CHIMIQUE AMELIOREE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5308804 (LEE HUAI-CHUAN [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 10-62 * * claims 1-6 * [Y] 1-18; | [XY]EP0598472 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 8-36 * * claims 1,22 * [Y] 1-18; | [XY]US5541142 (ARAUJO ROGER J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 10-55 * * column 3, lines 24-27 * * claims 1,4,8 * [Y] 1-18; | [XY]WO0188552 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, lines 15-24 * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-18; | [X]WO2005059017 (LEIBNIZ INST NEUE MATERIALIEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, line 3 * * page 4, line 4 * * page 6, line 5 * * page 8, line 3 - page 9, line 2; claims 1,2,5,6,11,12 *; | [XY]US2006087062 (LAINE RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 18 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 20 * * claims 1-13 *[Y] 1-18; | [XY]WO2006089738 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraphs 1-5 * * page 4, paragraph 6 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 5 * * claims 1,3,6-9,12,18-22 * [Y] 1-18 |