EP2251058 - IMPROVED TRACTION DEVICE APPLICABLE TO A CONDUCTOR CABLE FOR ENDOVENOUS TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arcusa Villacampa, Francisco Javier Avda. Josep Tarradellas, 91 08029 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Franco Lissott, Mailin Auxiliadora Avda. Josep Tarradellas, 91 08029 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Leal Monedero, Javier Avda.Josep Tarradellas 91 08029 Barcelona / ES | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio, et al Morgades, del Rio, Renter S.L. C/ Rector Ubach, 37-39 bj 2.o 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio, et al Morgades, del Rio, Renter S.L. C/ Rector Ubach, 37-39 bj 2.o 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 08736669.6 | 08.02.2008 | [2010/46] | WO2008ES00065 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009098328 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | ES | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251058 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/08, A61B18/22 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
A61B18/245 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ZUGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN LEITERKABEL FÜR ENDOVENÖSE BEHANDLUNGEN | [2010/46] | English: | IMPROVED TRACTION DEVICE APPLICABLE TO A CONDUCTOR CABLE FOR ENDOVENOUS TREATMENTS | [2010/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRACTION APPLICABLE À UN CÂBLE CONDUCTEUR POUR TRAITEMENTS ENDOVEINEUX | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2010 | Translation filed | 12.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4854325 (STEVENS ROBERT C [US]); | [Y]WO9812967 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]); | [A]US6485482 (BELEF W MARTIN [US]); | [Y]US2002177789 (FERRY STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A]US6726675 (BEYAR DALIA [IL]); | [A]FR2868954 (VAN CLEEF JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]WO2007008967 (CARDIAC INV S UNLTD INC [US], et al) |