EP2123558 - AIR CONDITIONING HOSE EXTENSION/RETRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peña Haro, Bienvenido Urbanización Zulema C/Jaén no. 11 Villabilla 28810 Madrid / ES | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Gonzalez Gomez, Maria Virtudes DK Dissen Mark, SL C/ Pedro Teixeira, 10, 5[deg] oficina 1 28020 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Gonzalez Gomez, Maria Virtudes C/ Pedro Teixeira, N. 10, 4[deg] 10. 28020 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08736716.5 | 27.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008ES00114 | Priority number, date | ES20070000628 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: ES 200700628 | [2009/48] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008110642 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123558 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/36, F24F13/02 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
F24F13/02 (EP,ES);
B64F1/362 (EP,ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | AUSZUGS-/EINZUGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KLIMAANLAGENSCHLÄUCHE | [2009/48] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING HOSE EXTENSION/RETRACTION DEVICE | [2009/48] | French: | ENROULEUR/EXTENSEUR DE TUYAUX D'AIR CONDITIONNÉ | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2009 | Translation filed | 09.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2939378 (ALLEN ZALKIND LOUIS); | [A]US3399545 (ANDERSON GORDON K, et al); | [Y]FR2742523 (PM X SARL [FR]); | [A]US2006199503 (WANG HWA-SIK [KR]); | [Y]WO2006136624 (SERVICIOS Y MANTENIMIENTOS AER [ES], et al) |