EP2169217 - WIND GENERATOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY INNOVATION & TECHNOLOGY, S.L. Avenida de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2019/16] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation&technology, S.L. Polígono Industrial Los Agustinos Calle A s/n 31013 Pamplona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCÍA ANDUJAR, Juan Carlos Gamesa Innovation & Technology Ramirez Arellano, 37 28043-Madrid / ES | 02 /
MATESANZ GIL, Álvaro Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos, calle A s/n E-31013 Pamplona / ES | 03 /
BASURTO RIVAS, Maite Parque Tecnológico de Zamudio, edificio 100 E-48170 Zamudio / ES | 04 /
RODRIGUEZ MARTIN, Manuel Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos, calle A s/n E-31013 Pamplona / ES | [2010/17] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
GARCÍA ANDUJAR, Juan Carlos Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos, calle A s/n E-31013 Pamplona / ES | ||
02 /
MATESANZ GIL, Álvaro Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos, calle A s/n E-31013 Pamplona / ES | |||
03 /
BASURTO RIVAS, Maite Parque Tecnológico de Zamudio, edificio 100 E-48170 Zamudio / ES | |||
04 /
RODRIGUEZ MARTIN, Manuel Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos, calle A s/n E-31013 Pamplona / ES | Representative(s) | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 08736730.6 | 27.02.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008ES70032 | Priority number, date | ES20070000535 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: ES 200700535 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008104629 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169217 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
F03D1/0633 (EP,US);
F05B2240/301 (EP,US);
F05B2250/314 (EP,US);
F05B2250/71 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | LAUFSCHAUFEL FÜR WINDKRAFTANLAGE | [2010/13] | English: | WIND GENERATOR BLADE | [2010/13] | French: | PALE POUR ÉOLIENNES | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2009 | Translation filed | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 21.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]EP1596063 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [XD] 1-3 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0009] - [0012] - [0014] , [0015] , [0018] - [0024] - [0038] , [0039] * [Y] 4-6 [I] 7; | [IY]US4533297 (BASSETT DAVID A [US]) [I] 7 * figures 1,2,4 * * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 18 * [Y] 4-6; | [XI]US2006216153 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0015] - [0039] * [I] 7 | International search | [X]US4533297 (BASSETT DAVID A [US]); | [Y]EP1596063 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]); | [Y]US2006216153 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]); | [A]US2007025856 (MOROZ EMILIAN M [US]); | [A]US2006067828 (WETZEL KYLE K [US]) | by applicant | EP1019631 | EP1596063 | US2006067828 |