EP2137823 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MATCHING AN ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulse Finland Oy Automaatiotie 1 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Pulse Finland Oy Takatie 6 90440 Kempele / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILOSAVLJEVIC, Zlatoljub Hallikuja 3 D 19 FI-90440 Kempele / FI | 02 /
KOSKINIEMI, Kimmo Hangaksentie 6 A FI-90310 Oulu / FI | 03 /
ANNAMAA, Petteri Vesakuja 5 FI-90460 Oulunsalo / FI | 04 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Prasadh Valtatie 20 as. 10 FI-90500 Oulu / FI | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Sepänkatu 20 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2010/01] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | Application number, filing date | 08736849.4 | 17.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008FI50200 | Priority number, date | FI20070005269 | 19.04.2007 Original published format: FI 20075269 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129125 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2137823 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H03H7/40, H03H11/30, H03H7/38 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
H04B1/0458 (EP,US);
H03H7/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H04B1/04, H03H7/40, H03H11/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ANPASSEN EINER ANTENNE | [2010/01] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR MATCHING AN ANTENNA | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR ADAPTATION D'ANTENNE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4201960 (SKUTTA FRANK R [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-9 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-5; | [AD]EP0685936 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [AD] 1-9 * page 4 - page 5; figures 3-4 *; | [A]WO9639727 (FLASH COMM INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 3 - page 8; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2003193997 (DENT PAUL W [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-9 * paragraphs [0033] , [0055] , [0074] - [0081]; figure 10 * [A] 3-5; | [A]US2004100341 (LUETZELSCHWAB ROLAND C [US], et al) [A] 1-9* column 4 - column 36; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4201960 (SKUTTA FRANK R [US], et al); | [A]US5589844 (BELCHER DONALD K [US], et al); | [A]EP1220456 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [A]US2004100341 (LUETZELSCHWAB ROLAND C [US], et al); | [A]WO2007042615 (PULSE FINLAND OY [FI], et al) |