|
20.06.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
88 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
88 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
72 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
19 |