EP2155548 - REINFORCED PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD New Filton House Filton Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSENTINO, Enzo c/o Airbus UK Limited New Filton House Filton Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | [2011/37] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
COSENTINO, Enzo c/o Airbus UK Limited New Filton House Filton Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | Representative(s) | Ribeiro, James Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Ribeiro, James Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2010/08] | Butler, Daniel James Airbus Operations Ltd IP Department, Building 09A Filton Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08737219.9 | 24.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008GB50294 | Priority number, date | GB20070009118 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: GB 0709118 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139214 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155548 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2155548 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/12, B64C3/26, B64C3/48 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
B64C1/12 (EP,KR,US);
B64C3/26 (EP,KR,US);
B64C3/48 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE PLATTE | [2010/08] | English: | REINFORCED PANEL | [2010/08] | French: | PANNEAU RENFORCE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2008 | AT | 14.09.2011 | BE | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | HR | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | MT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | NO | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | IE | 24.04.2012 | LU | 24.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
LU | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 24.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
BE | 14.09.2011 | ||
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
HR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
NO | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6010098 (CAMPANILE LUCIO FLAVIO [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-11 * column 1, line 52 - line 62 * * column 3, line 5 - line 9 * * column 3, line 46 - line 53 * * column 6, line 22 - line 23 * * column 6, line 52 - line 64; figure 10 * [A] 2,12; | [A]US6152405 (MUELLER DIETMAR [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 28 - line 29 * * column 6, line 25 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [X]US6375127 (APPA KARI [US]) [X] 1,9,11 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004108525 (FLEXSYS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP1714866 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1,11* paragraphs [0007] , [0011] , [0013] - [0016]; figure 1 * |