EP2150735 - A METHOD OF FORMING A SEAL TO A GAP, AS WELL AS A HOSE PORTION AND A HOSE ARRANGEMENT, ADAPTED TO BE ABLE TO BE USED IN SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klersy, Hans-Berth Moritzstrasse 41 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Bau-How AS Pb.1993 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLERSY, Hans-Berth Moritzstrasse 41 D-65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] |
Former [2010/06] | Danfelter, Maria Groth & Co i Malmö HB P.O. Box 6153 200 11 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 08737433.6 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008IB00897 | Priority number, date | SE20070000908 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: SE 0700908 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008125960 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150735 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/682, E04B1/684, F16J15/46 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
E04B1/6816 (EP);
E04B1/6813 (EP,SE);
E04B1/34815 (EP);
E04B1/6815 (SE);
F16J15/46 (SE)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | F16J15/46, E04B1/682, E04B1/684 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER DICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SPALT SOWIE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN SOLCH EINEM VERFAHREN AUSGEFÜHRTE(R) SCHLAUCHTEIL UND SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG | [2010/06] | English: | A METHOD OF FORMING A SEAL TO A GAP, AS WELL AS A HOSE PORTION AND A HOSE ARRANGEMENT, ADAPTED TO BE ABLE TO BE USED IN SUCH A METHOD | [2010/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN JOINT D'INTERSTICE, PARTIE DE TUYAU ET DISPOSITIF DE TUYAU CONÇUS POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS UN TEL PROCEDE | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 20.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2012 | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2014 | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1065922 (DOUGLAS HAROLD PERKINS); | [X]DE3038524 (LESCHUS GEB PUTSCH HILDEGARD [DE]); | [X]US5290045 (TERAUCHI MICHIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [XY]EP0894908 (PFLIEGER ADRIAN DIPL ING [DE]); | [YA]DE202006004638U (MEISTER PLAST GMBH [DE]) | International search | [A]US4741542 (KIMERLY JOHN C [US]); | [A]US2004076815 (REICHERT GERHARD [US]) | Examination | US4285612 |