EP2147250 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/41] |
Former [2013/39] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2010/04] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CENNINI, Giovanni c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CORNELISSEN, Hugo, J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RONDA, Cornelis, R. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LIU, Yadong c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08737825.3 | 14.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008IB51400 | Priority number, date | EP20070106322 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07106322 | EP20070117429 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07117429 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008126048 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147250 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21V33/00, G02B25/02 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G02B25/02 (EP,KR,US);
G02B3/08 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,KR,US);
B42D3/18 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/04] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2010/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 10.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]AU7346281 (HORGAN INVESTMENTS PTY LTD) [Y] 10 * page 3, line 6 - line 13 * * page 4, line 6 - line 9 * * page 5, line 9 - line 16 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9; | [YA]DE3620746 (LEITZ ERNST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 9 - line 23 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,5-10,14; | [YA]US4958913 (SCHAFFER IRVING [US]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 19 - line 32 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,4-6,9,10,14; | [YA]US5803572 (BRADA CARLA RAYE [US]) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 42 - line 51 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 13 * * column 5, line 24 - line 50 * * figures 1,2,5 * [A] 1,2,9,10; | [A]US2003063459 (MCCHESNEY PAULA [US]) [A] 1-4,7,9,10 * pages 1,2, paragraph 21 * * claim 1 ** figure 9 *; | [XA]US2003146688 (KITAZAWA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12,15 * page 1, paragraph 29 * * page 2, paragraphs 29,39 * * page 3, paragraph 51 - page 4, paragraph 56 * * figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,3,4A,4B,5 * [A] 14; | [XY]DE10261543 (ZEISS CARL [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9 * page 3, paragraph 44 * * page 4, paragraphs 47,49,55 * * claims 1,11,13 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,10,11,13; | [XA]US2004141302 (KOCH GENE C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,16-18,20-22 * page 3, paragraphs 32,33 * * page 4, paragraph 39 * * figures 1,7,8,14,15 * [A] 19; | [A]US2005213226 (WAGGONER JULI H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 12 * * figures 2-4 *; | [YA]DE202006011055U (RIBAG LICHT AG [CH]) [Y] 13 * page 2, paragraph 11 * * page 3, paragraph 14 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2,10,11 | by applicant | US6951403 |