EP2153702 - DRIVER APPARATUS FOR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUIJBRECHTS, Paulus, A., H., J. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MANDERS, Godfried, C., G., M. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08737906.1 | 18.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008IB51494 | Priority number, date | EP20070107072 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07107072 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008132646 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2153702 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153702 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/288 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H05B41/2883 (EP,US);
H05B41/384 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | ANSTEUERUNG FÜR EINE GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [2010/07] | English: | DRIVER APPARATUS FOR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP | [2010/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR UNE LAMPE À DÉCHARGE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 09.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HR | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | MT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | IE | 18.04.2011 | LU | 18.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | NO | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
LU | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 18.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
MT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
HR | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NO | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9638024 (PAUL JON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 13-18; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US6392365 (ZHOU RUI [US], et al) [A] 1-10* columns 1-6; compounds 1,3 *; | [A]WO03039206 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 3-7; figure 1 * |