EP2108072 - SYSTEM FOR THE REMOVABLE FASTENING OF WOOD-BLOCKS FOR WOOD FLOORING OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gio'Speedy Di Giovanni Iovene Via Ostian N. 8 81030 Castel Volturno / IT | [2017/24] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states Gio'Speedy Di Giovanni Iovene Via Ostian N. 8 81030 Castel Volturno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IOVENE, Giovanni Via A. Poliziano, 13 I-81030 Castel Volturno (CE) / IT | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Cipriani, Guido C&C Brevetti e Marchi s.r.l. Via Prisciano, 28 00136 Roma / IT | [2017/24] |
Former [2009/42] | Cirillo, Gennaro Brevetti Ing. Cirillo G. & C. SAS Via Santa Lucia 15 80132 Napoli / IT | Application number, filing date | 08738417.8 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/42] | WO2008IT00065 | Priority number, date | IT2007NA00021 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: IT NA20070021 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093383 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108072 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108072 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
E04F15/04 (EP);
E04F2015/02061 (EP);
E04F2015/02094 (EP);
E04F2201/023 (EP);
E04F2201/05 (EP);
F16B21/02 (EP);
F16B5/0635 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2009/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VORÜBERGEHENDEN BEFESTIGUNG VON HOLZBLÖCKEN FÜR HOLZBÖDEN ODER ÄHNLICHES | [2009/42] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE REMOVABLE FASTENING OF WOOD-BLOCKS FOR WOOD FLOORING OR THE LIKE | [2009/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION AMOVIBLE DE BLOCS DE BOIS POUR PLANCHER EN BOIS OU SIMILAIRE | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 01.02.2018 | LU | 01.02.2018 | MT | 01.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 01.02.2008 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
MT | 01.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
MT | 01.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
MT | 01.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 01.02.2018 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2818677 (GRP D EXPORTATION ET DE DIFFUS [FR]) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 2-4 * [I] 2; | [A]GB2409012 (HOY KEVIN DOUGLAS [GB]) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2003101673 (WEST RONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 1a,2-5,7 *; | [X]JP2003227224 (NIPPON JUTAKU PANEL KOGYO KYOD) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3024285 (TRANKER KURT) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE29707884U (FENNEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0443190 (WICONA BAUSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 * | Examination | EP0067640 |