EP2143415 - RECALCIFICATION PROMOTER AND COMPOSITION FOR ORAL CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANGI 11-6, Tsukiji 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKUMA, Shuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Sangi 11-6 Tsukiji 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZAKI, Tsutomu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Sangi 11-6 Tsukiji 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 03 /
ARAKAWA, Tadayoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Sangi 11-6 Tsukiji 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08738521.7 | 08.04.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008JP00909 | Priority number, date | JP20070103135 | 10.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007103135 | [2010/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008126410 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143415 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/24, A61Q11/00, C01B25/32 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/55 (US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | REKALZIFIKATIONSFÖRDERER UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR MUNDHÖHLE | [2010/02] | English: | RECALCIFICATION PROMOTER AND COMPOSITION FOR ORAL CAVITY | [2010/02] | French: | PROMOTEUR DE LA RECALCIFICATION ET COMPOSITION POUR CAVITÉ ORALE | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2009 | Translation filed | 05.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19858662 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 3 - line 24 * * page 1, line 48 - line 53 * * page 3, line 67 - page 4, line 5 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]US5683461 (LEE DOSUK D [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 8 - line 27 * * column 3, line 35 - line 60 * * column 9, line 11 - line 31 *; | [X]EP0165454 (WUERTT PARFUEMERIE [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 11 * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0786245 (SANGI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 14 * * column 8, line 30 - line 49 * * examples 2-4 * * claim - *; | [X]WO9818719 (AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ZAKRYT [RU], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * claim - * | International search | [X]US5037639 (TUNG MING S [US]); | [X]JPH0920508 (TOMITA PHARMA); | [X]JP2003034629 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [X]JP2001122748 (SANGI KK); | [X]JP2004035416 (SANGI KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH09202717 | JP2001122748 | JP2004035416 | - B. ANGMER; D. CARLSTROM; J.E. GLASS, "Studies on Ultrastructure of Dental Enemel IV: The Mineralization of normal Human Enamel", J. ULTRASTRUCTURE. RES., (1963), vol. 8, pages 12 - 23 | - F.A. DAMATO; R. STANG; K.W. STEPHEN, "Effect of Fluoride Concentration on Remineralization of Carious Enamel: an in vitro pH-Cycling Study", CARIES RES, (1990), vol. 24, pages 174 - 180 |