EP2141764 - DIRECTIONAL COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUCHI, Kazuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Masatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
ONAKA, Yasuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
HAMADA, Tomokazu c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
ISHIZAKA, Satoru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08740261.6 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008JP57164 | Priority number, date | JP20070107279 | 16.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007107279 | [2010/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129961 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141764 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/18, H01P5/16 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H01P5/16 (EP,KR,US);
H01P5/18 (KR);
H01P5/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | RICHTKOPPLER | [2010/01] | English: | DIRECTIONAL COUPLER | [2010/01] | French: | COUPLEUR DIRECTIONNEL | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2009 | Translation filed | 09.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2017 | 19.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2006186838 (TOKIMEC INC) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10,11,13,15 * page 6, paragraph 31 - page 7, paragraph 44 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * [I] 4,7,9,12,14; | [A]US5504465 (YUNG MING L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 43 * * figures 1-4 * * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS526058 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4310814 (BOWMAN DAVID F); | [A]JPS5721102 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH1117464 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS); | [A]WO02067367 (AXE INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2005236449 (NEC CORP) |