Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
29.03.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.06.2010 | Change - extension states | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
01.04.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
27.11.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
30.10.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.11.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.11.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.06.2008 | PCT data prior to European publication |