Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8211537 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2012 | B2 | US2010183862 | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP57194 | 11.04.2008 | JP2007106594 | 13.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2008133054 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP57194 | 11.04.2008 | JP2007106594 | 13.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2138522 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP57194 | 11.04.2008 | JP2007106594 | 13.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2683073 | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP57194 | 11.04.2008 | JP2007106594 | 13.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008133054 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007106594 | 13.04.2007 |