EP2151392 - FILM DISTRIBUTION CASE AND CASE WITH FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kureha Corporation 3-3-2, Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAEKI, Asako c/o Osaka Branch, Kureha Corporation 3-3-20 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka 530-8287 / JP | 02 /
YANAGISAWA, Mitsuru c/o Kureha Corporation 3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | 03 /
UMETSU, Tadashi c/o Kureha Corporation 3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
NASU, Asako C/O Kureha Corporasion 3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | ||
02 /
YANAGISAWA, Mitsuru C/O Kureha Corporasion 3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | |||
03 /
UMETSU, Tadashi C/O Kureha Corporasion 3-3-2 Nihonbashi-Hamacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8552 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08740707.8 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/06] | WO2008JP57662 | Priority number, date | JP20070126977 | 11.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007126977 | [2010/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008139837 | Date: | 20.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151392 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/72, B65D83/08, B65D85/672 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B65D83/0841 (EP,US);
B65D25/52 (KR);
B65D5/72 (KR);
B65D83/08 (KR);
B65D85/672 (EP,US);
Y10T225/238 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | B65D5/72, B65D25/52, B65D85/672 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | FOLIENABGABEGEHÄUSE UND GEHÄUSE MIT FOLIE | [2010/06] | English: | FILM DISTRIBUTION CASE AND CASE WITH FILM | [2010/06] | French: | BOÎTIER DE DISTRIBUTION DE FILM ET BOÎTIER AVEC FILM | [2010/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2009 | Translation filed | 12.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2082375 (PAPERBOARD IND CORP [CA]) [A] 1-5* page 4 - page 9; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JPH09165030 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] - [0023]; figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]JPH11171177 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001341733 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2004010139 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) | by applicant | JP2627139B | WO2007126977 |