EP2143113 - CONDUCTIVE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Toru c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
EGUCHI, Shingo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
OGURI, Noriaki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08740917.3 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008JP58232 | Priority number, date | JP20070112533 | 23.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007112533 | JP20080095107 | 01.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008095107 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008133338 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143113 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H01B1/16 (EP,US);
H01J29/864 (EP,US);
H01J31/127 (EP,US);
H01J2329/864 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGES ELEMENT | [2010/02] | English: | CONDUCTIVE MEMBER | [2010/02] | French: | ELÉMENT CONDUCTEUR | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005130024 (OTSUKI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * example 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO03073543 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-9; claims 1-73 *; | [X]EP1333079 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * example 1; claims 1-23 *; | [X]EP1090959 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-6; claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP0784326 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-21; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US5236631 (OSAWA YASUHISA [JP]) [X] 1-8 * examples 1-12; claims 1-7 * | by applicant | US2005130024 | WO03073543 | EP1333079 | EP1090959 | EP0784326 | US5236631 | JPH10284286 | JP2001143620 | US6494757 |