Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8430113 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2013 | B2 | US2010065763 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP58303 | 23.04.2008 | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5202516B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2013 | B2 | JPWO2008136490 | 29.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP58303 | 23.04.2008 | JP2009513020 | 23.04.2008 | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2141393 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP2141393 | 27.03.2013 | A4 | EP2141393 | 06.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008JP58303 | 23.04.2008 | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008136490 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100015843 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101668971 | 10.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007117001 | 26.04.2007 |