09.05.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
31.05.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
05.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
24.08.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
10.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
24.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.03.2012 |
First examination report |
|
10.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.06.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
20.05.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
20.05.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
20.05.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
06.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
04.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
07.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|