EP2139334 - 2-CYANOPHENYL FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, AND COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evotec AG Manfred Eigen Campus Essener Bogen 7 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2013/04] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Evotec AG Schnackenburgallee 114 22525 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Renovis, Inc. 2 Corporate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Zhi-Liang 888 Foster City Blvd, E4 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
DUNCTON, Matthew, Alexander, James One St. Francis Place Apt. 3502 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
KINCAID, John 4451-A 24th Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 04 /
KELLY, Michael G. 790 San Doval Place Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 05 /
O'MAHONY, Donogh 820 North Delaware Street 304 San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | 06 /
WANG, Zhan 580 Arastradero Road 204 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2013/27] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
WEI, Zhi-Liang 888 Foster City Blvd, E4 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
DUNCTON, Matthew, Alexander, James One St. Francis Place Apt. 3502 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | |||
03 /
KINCAID, John 4451-A 24th Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | |||
04 /
KELLY, Michael G. 790 San Doval Place Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | |||
05 /
O'MAHONY, Donogh 820 North Delaware Street 304 San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | |||
06 /
WANG, Zhan 580 Arastradero Road 204 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08742430.5 | 31.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US04208 | Priority number, date | US20070925109P | 17.04.2007 Original published format: US 925109 P | US20080010512P | 08.01.2008 Original published format: US 10512 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130481 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139334 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139334 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61P25/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P25/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/01] | A01N43/90, A61K31/517, C07D471/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE HETEROZYKLISCHE 2-CYANOPHENYL-VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE IHRE ANWENDUNG | [2010/01] | English: | 2-CYANOPHENYL FUSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, AND COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2010/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES FUSIONNÉS DE 2-CYANOPHÉNYLE, COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006217448 (KELLY MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims and examples *; | [A]WO2005066171 (RENOVIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims and examples *; | [E]WO2008123963 (RENOVIS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-31 * claims and examples * | International search | [X]US2006258689 (KELLY MICHAEL G [US], et al) |