|
10.02.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |