EP2145161 - MAGNETIC FLOWMETER TRANSMITTER WITH OUTPUT VERIFICATION CIRCUITRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/03] | MAGNETIC FLOWMETER OUTPUT VERIFICATION | ||
[2019/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Motion, Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2016/35] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Rosemount, Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Robert, K. 4075 Hallgren Lane Excelsior, MN 55331 / US | 02 /
FOSS, Scot, R. 16916 Honeysuckle Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 03 /
TOTENHAGEN, William, G. 6801 Redwing Lane Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 04 /
HUNTER, Kirk, A. 2506 Thrush Street Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
SCHULZ, Robert, K. 4075 Hallgren Lane Excelsior, MN 55331 / US | ||
02 /
FOSS, Scot, R. 16916 Honeysuckle Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | |||
03 /
TOTENHAGEN, William, G. 6801 Redwing Lane Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | |||
04 /
HUNTER, Kirk, A. 4200 Grime Avenue North Robbinsdale, MN 55422 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/02] |
Former [2010/03] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08742936.1 | 16.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US04885 | Priority number, date | US20070788392 | 19.04.2007 Original published format: US 788392 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130554 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145161 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145161 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60, G01F15/06, G01F25/00, G08C19/02 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US);
G01F15/063 (EP,US);
G01F15/065 (EP,US);
G01F15/068 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MESSWERTGEBER FÜR EINEN MAGNETISCHEN DURCHFLUSSMESSER MIT SCHALTUNG ZUR FUNKTIONSPRÜFUNG DES SIGNALAUSGANGS | [2019/28] | English: | MAGNETIC FLOWMETER TRANSMITTER WITH OUTPUT VERIFICATION CIRCUITRY | [2019/28] | French: | TRANSMETTEUR DE SIGNAL POUR UN DÉBITMÈTRE MAGNÉTIQUE AVEC CIRCUIT DE VÉRIFICATION DE LA SORTIE DES SIGNAUX | [2019/28] |
Former [2010/03] | AUSGABEVERIFIKATION EINES MAGNETISCHEN STRÖMUNGSMESSERS | ||
Former [2010/03] | MAGNETIC FLOWMETER OUTPUT VERIFICATION | ||
Former [2010/03] | VÉRIFICATION DE SORTIE DE DÉBITMÈTRE MAGNÉTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2008 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | GB | 16.04.2020 | IE | 16.04.2020 | LU | 16.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
GB | 16.04.2020 | ||
IE | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 16.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
GB | 16.04.2020 | ||
IE | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 16.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IE | 16.04.2020 | ||
LU | 16.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 16.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5469746 (FUKUNAGA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,14-16,18-20 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 33 * * column 8, line 19 - line 49; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]WO0034744 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [A] 1-3,14-16 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 32 * * page 12, line 17 - page 14, line 8; figures 1,8 *; | [A]WO2006104712 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,14-16 * page 5, line 12 - page 12, line 29; figures 1-6 * | Examination | US4704907 | US3802263 | US4227408 |