EP2129692 - ACTIVATION OF HUMAN ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS THROUGH CLEC-6 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute Suite 125, 3434 Live Oak Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANCHEREAU, Jacques, F. 6730 Northaven Dallas, TX 75230 / US | 02 /
OH, Sangkon 45 Caterham Court Baltimore, MD 21237 / US | 03 /
ZURAWSKI, Gerard 7620 Jordan Lane Midlothian, TX 76065 / US | 04 /
ZURAWSKI, Sandra 7620 Jordan Lane Midlothian, TX 76065 / US | 05 /
LI, Dapeng 6061 Village Bend 1004 Dallas, TX 75206 / US | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08743530.1 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008US54785 | Priority number, date | US20070891418P | 23.02.2007 Original published format: US 891418 P | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008103947 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2129692 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/14, A61P37/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/2851 (EP,US);
C07K17/14 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | C07K17/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | AKTIVIERUNG VON ZELLEN MIT MENSCHLICHEN ANTIGENEN DURCH CLEC-6 | [2009/50] | English: | ACTIVATION OF HUMAN ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS THROUGH CLEC-6 | [2009/50] | French: | ACTIVATION DE CELLULES HUMAINES PRESENTANT UN ANTIGENE PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE CLEC-6 | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03073827 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 19* the whole document *; | [I] - ARCE IGNACIO ET AL, "The human C-type lectin CLECSF8 is a novel monocyte/macrophage endocytic receptor.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200401), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 210 - 220, XP002593589 [I] 9-11,17,18,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/AJI.200324230 | [X] - FLORNES L M ET AL, "Identification of lectin-like receptors expressed by antigen presenting cells and neutrophils and their mapping to a novel gene complex", IMMUNOGENETICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00251-004-0714-X, (20041001), vol. 56, no. 7, ISSN 0093-7711, pages 506 - 517, XP002319046 [X] 9-11,17,18,20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00251-004-0714-x | [A] - BALCH S G ET AL, "CLONING OF A NOVEL C-TYPE LECTIN EXPRESSED BY MURINE MACROPHAGES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1074/JBC.273.29.18656, (19980717), vol. 273, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18656 - 18664, XP002935413 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.29.18656 | International search | [A]US2006269949 (HALLORAN PHILIP F [CA]); | [A] - MA, "Genome-Wide Analysis of Human Peripheral Leukocyte Gene Expression", PHD THESIS, (2003), page 51, 60, XP008113922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.20227 | [A] - SCHAFT N. ET AL., "Dendritic cell vaccination and other strategies to tip the balance of the immune system", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2008), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 913 - 928, XP019586741 |