EP2130206 - READ DISTURB REDUCTION CIRCUIT FOR SPIN TRANSFER TORQUE MAGNETORESISTIVE RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Sei Seung 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
KANG, Seung H. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
SANI, Mehdi Hamidi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08743709.1 | 06.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008US56090 | Priority number, date | US20070893229P | 06.03.2007 Original published format: US 893229 P | US20070771065 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: US 771065 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008109772 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130206 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130206 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/06, G11C11/16 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
G11C7/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/1673 (EP,KR,US);
G11C11/1675 (KR);
G11C5/063 (KR);
G11C7/062 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/067 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | LESESTÖRUNGSVERMINDERUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR MAGNETORESISITVEN STT-RAM | [2009/50] | English: | READ DISTURB REDUCTION CIRCUIT FOR SPIN TRANSFER TORQUE MAGNETORESISTIVE RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY | [2009/50] | French: | CIRCUIT DE RÉDUCTION DE PERTURBATION DE LECTURE POUR UNE MÉMOIRE MAGNÉTORÉSISTIVE À COUPLE DE TRANSFERT DE SPIN | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 19.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2008 | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | IE | 06.03.2015 | LU | 06.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | FR | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2015 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
BE | 09.07.2014 | ||
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2015 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2015 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
FR | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2015 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2003179602 (LEE GEUN IL [KR], et al); | [X]US2005122767 (PERNER FREDERICK A [US], et al); | [X]EP1560221 (SHARP KK [JP]); |