EP2139444 - SUSTAINED-RELEASE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaodong 126 East Cedar Street Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | 02 /
BATRA, Ashish 514 That Way, Apt. 225 Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
MEERBOTE, Michael Bachstr. 1 D-06193 Gutenberg / DE | 04 /
KOSENSKY, Linda 35 Valerie Drive Manville, NJ 08835 / US | 05 /
SCHILLER, Klaus Senffstr. 32 D-06120 Halle / DE | 06 /
NIETER, Elke Ahornring 25 ST 06179, Holleben / DE | [2010/08] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaodong 126 East Cedar Street Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | ||
02 /
BATRA, Ashish 514 That Way, Apt. 225 Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
03 /
MEERBOTE, Michael Bachstr. 1 D-06193 Gutenberg / DE | |||
04 /
KOSENSKY, Linda 35 Valerie Drive Manville, NJ 08835 / US | |||
05 /
SCHILLER, Klaus Senffstr. 32 D-06120 Halle / DE | |||
06 /
NIETER, Elke Hyazinthenstr. 11 D-06122 Halle / DE | Representative(s) | Hull, John Philip Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hull, John Philip Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744050.9 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US57444 | Priority number, date | US20070919222P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 919222 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008115961 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2139444 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/11, A61K8/81, A61K9/50, A61Q13/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2010/01] | English: | SUSTAINED-RELEASE COMPOSITION | [2010/01] | French: | COMPOSITION À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4489058 (LAY GEORGE E [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5955109 (WON RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * example 19; claim - *; | [X]US5372804 (KHOSHDEL EZAT [GB], et al) [X] 1-17 * example - *; | [X]US5145675 (WON RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 1, lines 55-60; example 5 *; | [X]EP0617051 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-17 * column 5, lines 23,24,50,51; example - *; | [X]US4664847 (WILLIAMS PHILIP L [GB]) [X] 1-17 * example - *; | [X]US6325994 (COLLIN NATHALIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-17 * example -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004005355 (AKAY GALIP [GB]) [A] 1-17 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5156843 (LEONG HELEN C [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim - * |