EP2144854 - WASTE TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovation Services, Inc. 342 Mapletree Drive Knoxville, TN 37922 / US | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOOLEY, Joseph, B. 222 Chestnut View Dr. Kingston, TN 37763 / US | 02 /
HUBRIG, Jeffrey, G. 342 Mapletree Dr. Knoxville, TN 37934 / US | 03 /
LOWDEN, Richard, A. 435 Mariner Point Dr. Clinton, TN 37716 / US | [2010/28] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
DOOLEY, Joseph, B. 222 Chestnut View Dr. Kingston, TN 37763 / US | ||
02 /
HUBRIG, Jeffrey, G. 342 Mapletree Dr. Knoxville, TN 37934 / US | |||
03 /
LOWDEN, Richard, A. 425 Mariner Point Dr. Clinton, TN 37716 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/49] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744382.6 | 26.03.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US58239 | Priority number, date | US20070697933 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 697933 | US20070697921 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 697921 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008124299 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144854 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144854 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68, C02F1/72 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
C02F1/4606 (EP,KR);
C02F1/727 (EP,KR);
A61L11/00 (EP);
C02F1/4672 (EP,KR);
C02F1/683 (EP,KR);
C02F2103/003 (EP,KR);
C02F2201/002 (KR);
C02F2209/05 (EP,KR);
C02F2209/40 (EP,KR);
C02F2209/42 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | ABFALLBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/03] | English: | WASTE TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2010/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES DÉCHETS | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 17.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12185069.7 / EP2537537 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2008 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | LU | 26.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.03.2008 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6274028 (HU CLYDE KUEN-HUA [TW] ET AL) [X] 1,4,6,7 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 4 * * column 8, line 50 - line 55 * [A] 2,3,5,8-10; | [XA]US4880510 (UHRICH KEVIN D [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 55 * [A] 2,4,5,8-10 | International search | [Y]US3864258 (RICHARDSON JOHN M, et al); | [Y]US4192742 (BEBIN JEAN [FR], et al); | [Y]US4992213 (MALLETT G TROY [US], et al); | [Y]US5073298 (GENTLE THOMAS M [US], et al); | [Y]US2002155044 (CIAMPI LEE EDWARD [US], et al); | [Y]US6521131 (HAMILTON RICHARD A [US], et al) |