EP2132701 - POINT OF PRESENCE DISTRIBUTION MECHANISM FOR DIGITAL CONTENT OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 140 East 45th Street, 15th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Excalibur IP, LLC 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Ronald 2679 Sacramento Street San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Ronald 1111 Green Street San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744500.3 | 27.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US58502 | Priority number, date | US20070694638 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694638 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008121733 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132701 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/955 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | POP-VERTEILUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR DIGITALE INHALTSOBJEKTE | [2009/51] | English: | POINT OF PRESENCE DISTRIBUTION MECHANISM FOR DIGITAL CONTENT OBJECTS | [2009/51] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DISTRIBUTION DE POINTS DE PRÉSENCE POUR OBJETS À CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | 29.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2020 | 16.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US2006224690 (FALKENBURG STEVEN J [US], et al) [X] 1, 22 * See abstract, claim 1 * [Y] 2-21, 23-24; | [Y]US5987480 (DONOHUE MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 2-21,23-24 * See abstract, claim 1 *; | [Y]US2002038384 (KHAN UMAIR A [US], et al) [Y] 2-21, 23-24 * See abstract, claim 1 *; | [Y]US6892226 (TSO MICHAEL MAN-HAK [US], et al) [Y] 2-21, 23-24 * See abstract, claim 1 * |