EP2139400 - TISSUE HARVESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis. TN 38116 / US | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 150 Minuteman Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWARD, Mark 1 Breighton Road Bubwith East Riding Y08 6LL / GB | 02 /
SMITH, Mark Chapman House Main Street Huby Y041 4DU / GB | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Curran, Clair Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Adcocks, Clair Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744717.3 | 31.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US58821 | Priority number, date | US20070909253P | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 909253 P | GB20070015429 | 08.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0715429 | US20070992210P | 04.12.2007 Original published format: US 992210 P | US20080006662P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 6662 P | US20080006663P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 6663 P | [2010/09] |
Former [2010/01] | US20070909253P | 30.03.2007 | |
GB20070015429 | 08.08.2007 | ||
US20070992210P | 04.12.2007 | ||
US20080006662 | 25.01.2008 | ||
US20080006663 | 25.01.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008121920 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139400 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139400 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/1635 (EP,US);
C12N5/0653 (US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/3205 (US);
A61M1/79 (EP,US);
A61B10/025 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00969 (EP,US);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | GEWEBEENTNAHME | [2010/01] | English: | TISSUE HARVESTING | [2010/01] | French: | RÉCOLTE DE TISSUS | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2011 | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HR | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | MT | 12.01.2011 | PL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | IE | 31.03.2011 | LU | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | NO | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | ES | 23.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.03.2011 | ||
LU | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.03.2011 | ||
LU | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
HR | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 12.01.2011 | |
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | HR | 12.01.2011 | |
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
NO | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3417248 (FERCH ALOIS) [X] 1-4,8-10,13,14,16,17 * abstract *; | [A]US2003130594 (HYNES RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0026]; figure 2 *; | [XY]WO03073945 (SANDOR GEORGE K B [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,13,14,16,17 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * [Y] 11,12,15; | [A]EP1378209 (TAKAHASHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2006098293 (TAKAHASHI ATSUSHI [JP]) [Y] 11,12,15 * abstract * |