EP2211926 - LIPID COATINGS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIV Scientific Holdings Ltd. ABM Chambers PO Box 2283, Road Town Tortola / VG | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Miv Therapeutics Inc. Unit 1, 8765 Ash Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6P 6T3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAKIMI-MEHR, Dorna 405 - 5958 Lona Drive Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 2L2 / CA | 02 /
LANDY, Mark 880 Glengate Place Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | 03 /
BUDZYNSKI, Vlad 1866 Fullerton Avenue North Vancouver British Columbia V7P 1X5 / CA | 04 /
CHEN, Michael, N.C. 3176 Patullo Crescent Coquitlam, British Columbia V3E 2R1 / CA | 05 /
TSVETKOV, Aleksy 3071 Springfield Drive Unit 11 Richmond, British Columbia / CA | 06 /
TSUI, Manus 36 - 7691 Moffatt Road Richmond, British Columbia V6Y 1X9 / CA | 07 /
YANG, Quanza 205-6230 Thunderbird Blvd. Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
HAKIMI-MEHR, Dorna 405 - 5958 Lona Drive Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 2L2 / CA | ||
02 /
LANDY, Mark 880 Glengate Place Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | |||
03 /
BUDZYNSKI, Vlad North Vancouver British Columbia / CA | |||
04 /
CHEN, Michael, N.C. 3176 Patullo Crescent Coquitlam, British Columbia V3E 2R1 / CA | |||
05 /
TSVETKOV, Aleksy 3071 Springfield Drive Unit 11 Richmond, British Columbia / CA | |||
06 /
TSUI, Manus 36 - 7691 Moffatt Road Richmond, British Columbia V6Y 1X9 / CA | |||
07 /
YANG, Quanza 205-6230 Thunderbird Blvd. Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744857.7 | 01.04.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008US59019 | Priority number, date | US20070978988P | 10.10.2007 Original published format: US 978988 P | US20070981273P | 19.10.2007 Original published format: US 981273 P | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009048645 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2211926 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/00, A61L31/08, A61L31/16 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61L31/146 (EP,US);
A61L31/08 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/22 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | LIPIDBESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINPRODUKTE | [2010/31] | English: | LIPID COATINGS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES | [2010/31] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS LIPIDIQUES POUR DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX IMPLANTABLES | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 13.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007207186 (SCANLON JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13-15,17,18,22-54 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 31,32 * * page 8, paragraphs 96,97 * * page 12, paragraph 121 * * page 22, paragraph 180 * * page 28, paragraph 207 * * page 30, paragraph 217 * * claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2005079200 (RATHENOW JORG [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,16,23,31,35,36,52-54 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 35 * * page 8, paragraphs 105,107 * * page 12, paragraph 127 * * claims 20,22,24 *; | [E]WO2009052516 (MIV THERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [E] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2008077247 (MIV THERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [E] 1-54 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20070952565 |