EP2134397 - HIGH FREQUENCY OSCILLATION RESPIRATORY THERAPY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CareFusion Corporation 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Allegiance Corporation 1430 Waukegan Road McGaw Park Illinois 60085-6787 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNSMORE, Thomas J. 2036 E. Linfield Street Glendora, CA 91740 / US | 02 /
WILSCHKE, Thomas C. 1251 W. Waveland, 3rd Floor Chicago, IL 60613 / US | 03 /
WISE, Geoffrey C. 421 Solano Drive Benicia, CA 91767 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Ruhrmann, Andrea Elizabeth, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08744956.7 | 02.04.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US59162 | Priority number, date | US20070921414P | 02.04.2007 Original published format: US 921414 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122045 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134397 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134397 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/12, A61M16/00, A61M16/16, A61M16/20 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A61M16/0096 (EP,US);
A61M11/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0006 (EP,US);
A61M16/127 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/43] | A61M16/00, A61M16/20, A61M16/16 | ||
Former IPC [2009/52] | A61M16/00, A61M16/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HF-OSZILLATIONSGERÄT FÜR ATEMTHERAPIE | [2009/52] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY OSCILLATION RESPIRATORY THERAPY DEVICE | [2009/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THÉRAPIE RESPIRATOIRE PAR OSCILLATIONS HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 13.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2008 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | GB | 02.04.2018 | IE | 02.04.2018 | LU | 02.04.2018 | MT | 02.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 02.04.2008 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
MT | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.04.2018 | ||
IE | 02.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.04.2018 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0411714 (LABAERE EMMANUEL [BE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19505409 (RAPP NORBERT JOSEF [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,11,15 * The whole document especially figure 1 *; | [A]US5890998 (HOUGEN EVERETT DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US6152130 (ABRAMS ANDREW L [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]US2003127092 (PELEROSSI RICHARD K [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US6595203 (BIRD FORREST M [US]) [X] 1-8,11-18 * The whole document especially figures 4, 5 *; | [X]EP1516640 (COMEDICA INC [US]) [X] 1-11,15,16 * The whole document especially figure 1, 2 and paragraphs [0020]-[0037] *; | [A]US2006162722 (BOEHM ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006213507 (FOLEY MARTIN P [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-8,14-16,32 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0087] * | International search | [Y]US6067984 (PIPER SAMUEL DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-23* col 9, ln 50-60 *; | [Y]US2007023036 (GRYCHOWSKI JERRY R [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * para [0032], (0037], [0038], [0046]. [0054], [0069], [0078], [0093], [0106] * | by applicant | DE19505409 | US6595203 | EP1516640 | US2006213507 | US7191780 |