EP2147083 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING A MIDDLE DISTILLATE PRODUCT AND LOWER OLEFINS FROM A HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADJIGEORGE, George A. 2402 Cypress Hill Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | 02 /
MO, Weijian 719 Winston Lane Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | 03 /
SCHAVERIEN, Colin John Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 08745435.1 | 10.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US59825 | Priority number, date | US20070911715P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911715 P | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008127956 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147083 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, C10G51/00, C10G51/02, C10G51/06, C10G3/00 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,KR,US);
C10G3/49 (EP,US);
C10G3/57 (EP,US);
C10G3/62 (EP,US);
C10G51/00 (EP,US);
C10G51/02 (KR);
C10G51/026 (EP,US);
C10G51/06 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1014 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1018 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1037 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1044 (US);
C10G2300/1059 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MITTELDESTILLATPRODUKTS UND NIEDERER OLEFINE AUS EINEM KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-EINSATZSTOFF | [2010/04] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MAKING A MIDDLE DISTILLATE PRODUCT AND LOWER OLEFINS FROM A HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCK | [2010/04] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT DISTILLÉ INTERMÉDIAIRE ET D'OLÉFINES INFÉRIEURES À PARTIR D'UNE CHARGE D'HYDROCARBURE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3748251 (DEMMEL E, et al) [X] 1-13 * claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [XY]US3894933 (OWEN HARTLEY, et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [XY]US3928172 (DAVIS JR FRANCIS E, et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 3; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [XY]US3974062 (OWEN HARTLEY, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 1 - line 11; figure 1; example 1; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [Y]NL8700587 (LUMMUS CREST B V) [Y] 14-21 * example 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US4830728 (HERBST JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0325437 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [XY]US5944982 (LOMAS DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 29 - line 67; figure 2; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [XY]EP1170355 (TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION [FR]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 14-21; | [Y]US2005003957 (VAUGHN STEPHEN N [US], et al) [Y] 14-21* paragraph [0076]; claims 22,23,34 *; | [XY]WO2006020547 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 1; claims 1-12 * [Y] 14-21 |