EP2147320 - A FORCE SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD TO DETERMINE THE RADIUS OF ROTATION OF A MOVING OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keynetik, Inc. 2883 Franklin Oaks Drive Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHKOLNIKOV, Mark 2883 Franklin Oaks Drive Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Staudt IP Law Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Staudt, Hans-Peter, et al Bittner & Partner Intellectual Property Division Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08745652.1 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US60091 | Priority number, date | US20070911745P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911745 P | US20080027118 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: US 27118 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128087 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147320 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G01P15/18 (EP,KR,US);
G01P15/00 (EP,US);
G01P15/08 (KR);
G06F1/1626 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2200/1637 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | KRÄFTEMESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES DREHUNGSRADIUS EINES SICH BEWEGENDEN OBJEKTS | [2010/04] | English: | A FORCE SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD TO DETERMINE THE RADIUS OF ROTATION OF A MOVING OBJECT | [2010/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE FORCE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LE RAYON DE ROTATION D'UN OBJET MOBILE | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0186920 (LAPIDOT ZVI [IL]); | [A]US2002190947 (FEINSTEIN DAVID Y [US]); | [A]US6640609 (NADKARNI VIVEK B [US], et al); | [A] - GAETANO CANEPA ET AL., "Kinematic Calibration by Means of a Triaxial Accelerometer", IEEE, (1994), pages 2776 - 2782, XP000481082 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1994.350917 |