EP2142034 - DIFFUSION DEVICE WITH REPLACEABLE CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prolitec Inc. 1235 Canal Street Milwaukee, WI 53233 / US | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Marc S67 W30191 County Road I Mukwonago, Wisconsin 53149 / US | 02 /
WEENING, Richard 201 East Lakewood Road West Palm Beach, Florida 33405 / US | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/02] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08745657.0 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008US60096 | Priority number, date | US20070734660 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: US 734660 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128091 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142034 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2142034 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/02, A61L9/12, B05B7/24 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B05B7/30 (US);
A61L2209/133 (US);
A61M11/06 (US);
A61M16/16 (US);
F16N7/34 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/02] | A45D34/02, A61L9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | DIFFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSWECHSELBARER KARTUSCHE | [2010/02] | English: | DIFFUSION DEVICE WITH REPLACEABLE CARTRIDGE | [2010/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIFFUSION AVEC CARTOUCHE REMPLAÇABLE | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2008 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.04.2008 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3352496 (LIPSKE BENJAMIN B) [X] 1,3-8 * column 3; figure 2 * * column 3, line 26 - line 37 *; | [X]US3478933 (ROUSSELOT FELIX) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 35 - line 55 *; | [XI]US3704811 (HARDEN JOSEPH T JR) [X] 1,3,6-8 * figure 1 * * column 1, paragraph 3 * [I] 4; | [X]GB1326069 (RESPIRATORY CARE) [X] 1,3-8* page 2, line 29 - line 55; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2001149459 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2001225884 (ST CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2002066798 (LAUDAMIEL-PELLET CHRISTOPHE [US], et al); | [A]US6619559 (WOHRLE GREGORY D [US]) | by applicant | US3352496 | US3478933 | US3704811 | GB1326069 |