|
08.05.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
26.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
13.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
23 |