EP2146646 - SELF-RETAINING SUTURES FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/04] | SELF RETAINING SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES | ||
[2018/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Calle C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Angiotech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 1B6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, William, L. 1618 Station Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6A 186 / CA | 02 /
HERRMANN, Robert, A. 1508-1082 Seymour Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 1X9 / CA | 03 /
NAIMAGON, Alexander 11-8711 General Curric Road Richmond, British Columbia V6Y 1H3 / CA | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/27] |
Former [2012/33] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Teall, Charlotte, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Dale, Charlotte Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08745687.7 | 11.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US60127 | Priority number, date | US20070911814P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911814 P | US20080062214 | 03.04.2008 Original published format: US 62214 | US20080062256 | 03.04.2008 Original published format: US 62256 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128113 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146646 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146646 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61B17/04 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61L33/00 (KR);
A61B17/064 (KR);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2010/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTHALTENDE CHIRURGISCHES NÄHTE FÜR CHIRURGISCHE VERFAHREN | [2018/02] | English: | SELF-RETAINING SUTURES FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES | [2018/02] | French: | SUTURES AUTO-RÉTENTIVES POUR INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES | [2018/02] |
Former [2010/04] | SELBSTHALTENDE SYSTEME FÜR CHIRURGISCHE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2010/04] | SELF RETAINING SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL PROCEDURES | ||
Former [2010/04] | SYSTÈMES AUTOMATIQUES POUR INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 17.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18181513.5 / EP3409214 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2008 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 05.11.2018 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.04.2008 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3123077 (ALCAMO) [X] 37-43,50,55 * the whole document * [Y] 44-49,51-54,56-58,61-68; | [XY]GB1091282 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 37 * figures 9-11 * [Y] 44,45,48,49; | [XY]US6264675 (BROTZ GREGORY R [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-14 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 59 * * column 3, lines 7,33-53 * [Y] 46,47; | [A]WO03001979 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 9, lines 26-31 * * page 11, lines 9-16 ** page 12, lines 6-20 *; | [XY]WO03017850 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 59,60,73,74,76,79-96 * the whole document * [Y] 56-58,77,78; | [XY]WO2004030705 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 59,60,72-75 * abstract * * page 3, lines 18-30 * * page 17, lines 18-30 * * page 36, lines 21-25 * [Y] 52-54,61-71,77,78; | [X]US2005267532 (WU TZE LIANG W [SG]) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0043] - [0081] - [0084] *; | [X]WO2006005144 (BERAMENDI JOSE ANTONIO ENCINAS [BR]) [X] 1 * page 11, lines 2-9; figure 12 *; | [A]DE102005004317 (ETHICON GMBH [DE]) [A] 37 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2006079469 (ETHICON GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 51,69-71 * abstract * * page 8, lines 6-17 * |