EP2136653 - EMBEDDED LIQUID LUBRICANTS FOR TABLETING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Yong 5300 Turnberry Park Drive Glen Allen, Virginia 23059 / US | 02 /
GOLDBERG, Alan, M. 78 Hopper Avenue Nutley, New Jersey 07110 / US | 03 /
GOODE, Michael, A. 3992 Maidens Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | 04 /
BARTOLUCCI, Raymond, Alan 50 Lorraine Boulevard Poughkeepsie, New York 12603 / US | 05 /
FRAZIER, James, O. 3363 Harris Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/09] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2010/32] | Rutt, Jason Edward, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08745723.0 | 14.04.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US60188 | Priority number, date | US20070787381 | 16.04.2007 Original published format: US 787381 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008130883 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136653 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136653 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A23L33/15, A23L33/16 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A23L33/15 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,CN,US);
A23L29/035 (EP,US);
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A23P10/10 (KR);
A23P10/25 (EP,US);
A23P10/28 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/192, A23V2200/222, A23V2200/30 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/192, A23V2200/222, A23V2200/30, A23V2002/00, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/71 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/71 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | A23L1/302, A23L1/304, A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 14.10.2009 | BA | 14.10.2009 | MK | 14.10.2009 | RS | 14.10.2009 | Title | German: | EINGEBETTETE FLÜSSIGGLEITMITTEL FÜR TABLETTIERUNG | [2010/01] | English: | EMBEDDED LIQUID LUBRICANTS FOR TABLETING | [2010/01] | French: | LUBRIFIANTS LIQUIDES INCORPORÉS POUR FABRICATION DE COMPRIMÉS | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13154734.1 / EP2599394 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | IS | 29.03.2018 | LU | 14.04.2018 | MT | 14.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/08] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
MT | 14.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 29.11.2017 | |
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | HR | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/22] | LT | 29.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5266615 ; | [X]US3619292 (BROUILLARD ROBERT E, et al) [X] 1-49 * column 2, line 54 - line 63 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 23 * * example 9 *; | [X]US3619462 (DINES ALLEN I, et al) [X] 1-49 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 2, line 18 - line 30 * * column 3, line 19 - line 35 * * column 4, line 1 - line 38 *; | [X]US3655852 (KOFF ARNOLD, et al) [X] 1-49* examples 1-3 *; | [X]GB1422974 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1-49 * page 2, line 56 - line 89 * * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 16 * * example 1 *; | [X]EP0062225 (BASF WYANDOTTE CORP [US]) [X] 1-49 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 35 * * page 6, line 21 - line 25 * * example 1 *; | [X]GB2142824 (AMERICAN HOME PROD) [X] 1-49 * page 1, line 56 - line 59 * * page 2, line 15 - line 38 * * page 3, line 7 - line 17 *; | [X]US4603143 (SCHMIDT DOUGLASS N [US]) [X] 1-49 * column 2, line 5 - line 35 * * column 2, line 49 - line 68 * * column 3, line 6 - line 15 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO9104018 (CIMA LABS INC [US]) [X] 1-49 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 27 * * page 8, line 3 - line 21 * * page 10, line 9 - line 34 * * page 12, line 11 - line 31 * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 5 * * page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 33 * * examples I-XVIII *; | [X]JP2000178206 (FANCL CORP) [X] 1-49 * abstract *; | [X]US6162474 (CHEN CHYI-CHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-49 * example 5; table 6 *; | [X]US2001009679 (CHEN CHYI-CHENG [CH], et al) [X] 1-49 * example 2; table 1 *; | [X]JP2002188095 (FANCL CORP) [X] 1-49 * abstract *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 28, Database accession no. 1977-49626Y, XP002492710 & JPS5266615 A 19770602 (SAWAI SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-49 * abstract * |