|
05.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |