Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101122195B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B1 | KR20100005219 | 14.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | WO2008US60519 | 16.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010525672 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | WO2008US60519 | 16.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2137546 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP2137546 | 30.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | WO2008US60519 | 16.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101657734B | 13.11.2013 | B | CN101657734 | 24.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | WO2008US60519 | 16.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008131031 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2009 | A3 | WO2008131031 | 30.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8026845 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2011 | B2 | US2009033550 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5335944B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B2 | JP2012147448 | 02.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US10351208 | 15.04.2008 | US91213607 | 16.04.2007 |