EP2144550 - RETRACTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/03] | MINIMALLY OPEN INTERBODY ACCESS RETRACTION DEVICE AND SURGICAL METHOD | ||
[2020/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K2M, Inc. 600 Hope Parkway SE Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states K2M, Inc. 600 Hope Parkway SE Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | ||
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states K2M, Inc. 751 Miller Drive, SE, Suite F-1 Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOREK, Josef 12 Southwood Avenue Ross, CA 94957 / US | 02 /
KRISCIUNAS, Linda 822 Saddleback Place Leesburg, VA 20176 / US | 03 /
ROSS, Catherine 4731 Arlington Boulevard Arlington, VA 20176 / US | 04 /
HAGGENMAKER, Jennifer 2877 Lewisville Road Summit Point, WV 25446 / US | 05 /
STRAUSS, Kevin 5358 Tarkington Place Columbia, MD 21044 / US | [2010/24] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
GOREK, Josef 12 Southwood Avenue Ross, CA 94957 / US | ||
02 /
KRISCIUNAS, Linda 6204 Windham Hill Run Alexandria, VA 22315 / US | |||
03 /
ROSS, Catherine 4731 Arlington Boulevard Arlington, VA 20176 / US | |||
04 /
HAGGENMAKER, Jennifer 2877 Lewisville Road Summit Point, WV 25446 / US | |||
05 /
STRAUSS, Kevin 5358 Tarkington Place Columbia, MD 21044 / US | |||
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
GOREK, Josef 12 Southwood Avenue Ross, CA 94957 / US | ||
02 /
KRISCIUNAS, Linda 6204 Windham Hill Run Alexandria, VA 22315 / US | |||
03 /
ROSS, Catherine 1600 Spring Gate Drive, 2407 Mclean, VA 22102 / US | |||
04 /
HAGGENMAKER, Jennifer 2877 Lewisville Road Summit Point, WV 25446 / US | |||
05 /
STRAUSS, Kevin 5358 Tarkington Place Columbia, MD 21044 / US | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/21] |
Former [2010/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08746083.8 | 17.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US60602 | Priority number, date | US20070925056P | 17.04.2007 Original published format: US 925056 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008131084 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2144550 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144550 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/32, A61B17/02, A61B17/16, A61B17/70 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/025 (EP,US);
A61B17/0206 (EP,US);
A61B17/56 (US);
A61B17/7077 (EP,US);
A61B17/7082 (EP,US);
A61B17/0293 (EP,US);
A61B17/1655 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00407 (US);
A61B2017/0256 (US);
A61B2017/2837 (EP,US);
A61B90/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | A61B1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RETRAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MINIMAL-INVASIVE WIRBELSÄULENCHIRURGIE | [2020/42] | English: | RETRACTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉTRACTION POUR LA CHIRURGIE SPINALE PEU INVASIVE | [2020/42] |
Former [2010/03] | EINZUGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MINIMAL OFFENEN INTERKORPORALEN ZUGANG UND CHIRURGISCHES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2010/03] | MINIMALLY OPEN INTERBODY ACCESS RETRACTION DEVICE AND SURGICAL METHOD | ||
Former [2010/03] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉTRACTION INTERCORPOREL À ACCÈS OUVERT MINIMAL ET PROCÉDÉ CHIRURGICAL | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2008 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.04.2008 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.04.2008 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5167223 (KOROS TIBOR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-12 * the whole document * [I] 4,6; | [X]US5728046 (MAYER HEINZ MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US5944658 (KOROS TIBOR B [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US6139493 (KOROS TIBOR B [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002077531 (PUCHOVSKY SYLVIA [US], et al) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]US2003149341 (CLIFTON GUY L [US]) [X] 13,14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5339801 (POLOYKO ALEXANDER [US], et al)[A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US5512038 (O'NEAL DARRELL D [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US5967972 (SANTILLI ALBERT N [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US6322500 (SIKORA GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US2002095139 (KEOGH JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US6447443 (KEOGH JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US6599292 (RAY CHARLES D [US]) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [A]US6599240 (PUCHOVSKY SYLVIA [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-24; | [X]US2005234304 (DEWEY JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 22-24 * , para [0051]-[0062], [0065]-[0067] *; | [A]US7150714 (MYLES ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1-4, 22-24 | Examination | US6206826 | US2005277812 | WO2006017886 | by applicant | US5725528 | US2003149341 | US2007106123 | US2008027432 |