EP2152853 - IN VITRO MODEL OF LATENT MYCOBACTERIAL INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Central Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 12201 Research Parkway, Suite 501 Orlando FL 32826-3246 / US | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLATTUKUDY, Papachan, E. University Of Central Florida Research Foundation Inc. 12201 Research Pkwy., Ste. 501 Orlando, FL 32826-3246 / US | 02 /
SIRAKOVA, Tatiana University Of Central Florida Research Foundation Inc. 12201 Research Pkwy., Ste. 501 Orlando, FL 32826-3246 / US | 03 /
DANIEL, Jaiyanth University Of Central Florida Research Foundation Inc. 12201 Research Pkwy., Ste. 501 Orlando, FL 32826-3246 / US | 04 /
DEB, Chirajyoti University Of Central Florida Research Foundation Inc. 12201 Research Pkwy., Ste. 501 Orlando, FL 32826-3246 / US | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Bullett, Rachel Margaret, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08746514.2 | 22.04.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US61110 | Priority number, date | US20070914838P | 30.04.2007 Original published format: US 914838 P | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134298 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152853 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/12, C12N1/20 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
C12N1/36 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | IN-VITRO-MODELL EINER LATENTEN MYKOBAKTERIENINFEKTION | [2010/07] | English: | IN VITRO MODEL OF LATENT MYCOBACTERIAL INFECTION | [2010/07] | French: | MODÈLE IN VITRO D'INFECTION MYCOBACTÉRIENNE LATENTE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ZAHRT THOMAS C, "Molecular mechanisms regulating persistent Mycobacterium tuberculosis infection.", MICROBES AND INFECTION, (200302), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1286-4579, pages 159 - 167, XP002580440 [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0004]; figure 3 * * paragraph [04.3] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1286-4579(02)00083-7 | [X] - CAPPELLETTY ET AL, "Evaluation of an intracellular pharmacokinetic in vitro infection model as a tool to assess tuberculosis therapy", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.IJANTIMICAG.2006.10.001, (20070112), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0924-8579, pages 212 - 216, XP005827912 [X] 4-7 * abstract * * page 213, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 2(b),3 * * page 215, column 2, line 11 - line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijantimicag.2006.10.001 | [A] - DANIEL JAIYANTH ET AL, "Induction of a novel class of diacylglycerol acyltransferases and triacylglycerol accumulation in Mycobacterium tuberculosis as it goes into a dormancy-like state in culture", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200408), vol. 186, no. 15, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 5017 - 5030, XP002580441 [A] 1-10 * page 5028, column 2, lines 12-20 * * page 5028, column 2, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.15.5017-5030.2004 | [A] - WAYNE L G ET AL, "Nonreplicating persistence of mycobacterium tuberculosis.", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11544352, (2001), vol. 55, ISSN 0066-4227, pages 139 - 163, XP002580442 [A] 1-10 * page 144 - page 145 * | [T] - DEB CHIRAJYOTI ET AL, "A Novel In Vitro Multiple-Stress Dormancy Model for Mycobacterium tuberculosis Generates a Lipid-Loaded, Drug-Tolerant, Dormant Pathogen", PLOS ONE, (200906), vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1932-6203, XP002580443 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006077 | [A] - MARIAM DENEKE H ET AL, "Effect of rpoB mutations conferring rifampin resistance on fitness of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (200404), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1289 - 1294, XP002580444 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.48.4.1289-1294.2004 | [A] - THEUS S A ET AL, "Activated THP-1 cells: An attractive model for the assessment of intracellular growth rates of Mycobacterium tuberculosis isolates.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200402), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1169 - 1173, XP002580445 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.72.2.1169-1173.2004 | International search | [X]US7105170 (QUINN FREDERICK D [US], et al); | [X] - BETTS J.C. ET AL., "Evaluation of a nutrient starvation model of Mycobacterium tuberculosis persistance by gene and protein expression profiling", MOL. MICROBIOL., (200202), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 717 - 731, XP002223692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2958.2002.02779.x | [Y] - SIRAKOVA T.D. ET AL, "Identification of a diacylglycerol acyltransferase gene involved in accumulation of triacylglycerol in Mycobacterium tuberculosis under stress", MICROBIOLOGY, (200609), vol. 152, no. 9, pages 2717 - 2725, XP008123057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/MIC.0.28993-0 | [Y] - AUWERX J., "The human leukemia cell line, THP-1: a multifacetted model for the study of monocyte-macrophage differentiation", EXPERIENTIA, (19910115), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 22 - 31, XP000218599 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02041244 | [Y] - CHAUHAN, "Effect of Carbon Dioxide on the primary isolation of Mycobacteria", INDIAN JOUR. TUBERCULOSIS, (1991), vol. 38, pages 81 - 85, XP008123502 | [Y] - MUTTUCUMARU ET AL., "Gene expression profile of Mycobacterium tuberculosis in anon-replicating state", TUBERCULOSIS, (200405), vol. 84, pages 239 - 246, XP008123058 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.TUBE.2003.12.006 | Examination | - C. J. RIENDEAU ET AL, "THP-1 Cell Apoptosis in Response to Mycobacterial Infection", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (20030101), vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1128/IAI.71.1.254-259.2003, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 254 - 259, XP055130564 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.71.1.254-259.2003 |